Sidler, Martin (CPSO#: 108248)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Zurich, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2015 to 07 Feb 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Nov 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2016