Siebert, Lee Francis (CPSO#: 28716)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee F. Siebert Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Document Storage and Records Management 100 Piccadilly Street London, ON N6A 1R8 Tel: 519 672 1460 Fax: 519 672 8096
Date Received: 14 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2015