Siemens, David Robert (CPSO#: 65432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2411
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siemens Jaeger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. D. Siemens ( CPSO# 65432 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology - Empire 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2411

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology & Perioperative Medi
Victory 2 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT SIEMENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIEMENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993