Siemiatycki, Deborah Ghita (CPSO#: 59976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3077 Bathurst St., Suite 201
Toronto ON  M6A 1Z9
Phone: (416) 633-3554
Fax: (416) 633-3559
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH GHITA SIEMIATYCKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIEMIATYCKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991