Sieminowski, Tammy Eileen (CPSO#: 66535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8251 Ext. 1969
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sieminowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sieminowski ( CPSO# 66535 )

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMMY EILEEN SIEMINOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIEMINOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995