Sievenpiper, John Lamport (CPSO#: 91363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
#6137-61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7460 Ext. 8045
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LAMPORT SIEVENPIPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIEVENPIPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014