Sigalas, John (CPSO#: 56213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Ioannina, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 308
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 283-8119
Fax: (416) 283-8168
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Health
Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 283-8119
Fax: (416) 283-8168
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Sigalas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sigalas ( CPSO# 56213 )

Business Address:
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN SIGALAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIGALAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1989