Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sijan, Dusan (CPSO#: 24848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Zagreb, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-1661
Fax: 519-974-2013
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: 519-257-5143
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sijan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sijan ( CPSO# 24848 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 30 Jun 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSAN SIJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIJAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1972