Sikaneta, Samuel Sibafuzi (CPSO#: 41727)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014