Sikaneta, Tabo Gordon (CPSO#: 70204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 238
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tabo Sikaneta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sikaneta ( CPSO# 70204 )

Business Address:
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (647) 285-8853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TABO GORDON SIKANETA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKANETA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000