Silberberg, Phillip Joseph (CPSO#: 57944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3111 East St James Court
Bloomington IN  47401
United States
Phone: (812) 606-6586

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Indiana
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Tennessee
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP JOSEPH SILBERBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILBERBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1987