Silberman, Shalom (CPSO#: 64556)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiothoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002