Silva, Enrique (CPSO#: 43822)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 04 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2013