Silva, Harini Geethanee (CPSO#: 83197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Green Street Medical
16 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3R2
Phone: (613) 825-9799
Fax: (613) 825-5963
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harini Silva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Silva ( CPSO# 83197 )

Business Address:
16 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3R2
Phone Number: (613) 825-9799

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARINI GEETHANEE SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007