Silva, Jaime Enrique (CPSO#: 63280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Libre de Colombia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site McMaster Clinic
Room 516
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905)662-3263
Fax: (905) 662-3304
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIME ENRIQUE SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 27 Aug 1991
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1996