Silva, Joaquin Jaime (CPSO#: 68156)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999