Silva Restrepo, Marcos (CPSO#: 90180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
M3 200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4864
Fax: 416-480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silva Restrepo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silva Restrepo ( CPSO# 90180 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite M3 200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCOS SILVA RESTREPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVA RESTREPO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 13 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015