Silva Ruette, Enrique Gerardo (CPSO#: 41332)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Silva-Ruete, Enrique Gerardo (used until: 24 Mar 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Bahia, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 07 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2009

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 May 2003
Summary:

 On May 26, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Silva-Ruette to have committed and act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional 
 conduct with respect to his care of a female patient.

The Committee ordered the following 
 penalty:

1)	that Dr. Silva-Ruette be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 	register,
2)	that Dr. Silva-Ruette(s certificate of registration be suspended for 9 months 
 commencing 	June 23, 2003,
3)	that a limitation be placed on Dr. Silva-Ruette(s certificate of 
 registration that he will not 	conduct physical examinations of female patients,
4)	that Dr. 
 Silva-Ruette will obtain written acknowledgements from patients of their 	awareness of the 
 condition/limitation on his certificate of registration and will keep the 	acknowledgement in the 
 patient record,
5)	that the College will have the right to attend at Dr. Silva-Ruette(s office on 
 a random 	basis once per year to conduct a chart pull to ensure that Dr. Silva-Ruette has obtained 
 the 	aforementioned written acknowledgements,
6)	that Dr. Silva-Ruette will complete the College(s 
 boundary course within the next 12 	months,
7)	that Dr. Silva-Ruette will pay costs to the College 
 in the amount of $2,500.00 prior to the 	end of the inspection; and
8)	that Dr. Silva-Ruette has 
 agreed to post a letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00 to 	guarantee the payment of funding 
 provided to the patient under the programming 		specified in section 85.7 of the Code.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 26, 2003

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: August 27, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Enrique Gerardo Silva Ruette to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Enrique G. Silva Ruette:

1).Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
2). Undertake never to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
3). Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
4). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations, as set out in the Notice of Hearing dated August 6, 2008, that I engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In particular, it is alleged that I failed to maintain proper boundaries in my relationship with a female patient for whom I provided psychiatric care.
5). Agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the investigation and prosecution of the allegations referred to at paragraph 4.