Silva, Vincent Eugene (CPSO#: 64460)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2013


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2013