Silver, Eric Stuart (CPSO#: 58147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 486-8788
Fax: (416) 486-4515
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1118
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 593-7700
Fax: (416) 593-7702
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Silver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Silver ( CPSO# 58147 )

Business Address:
103 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 486-8788

Business Address:
Suite 1118
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 593-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC STUART SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1988