Silver, Esther Rachel (CPSO#: 61571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Silver-Bensusan, Esther Rachel (used until: 07 Jul 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Hadassah Medical School, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1881 Steeles Avenue, West
Toronto ON  M3H 5T8
Phone: 2892170594
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 May 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 May 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 13, 2010, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Esther Rachel Silver, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Silver to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Esther Rachel Silver's practice is restricted as follows:

                  i.    to limit her practice to paediatrics and psychotherapy;
                  
                  ii.   to not knowingly provide treatment to any patient with a diagnosis
                        of Borderline Personality Disorder; and
                  
                  iii.  to not treat any one patient with psychotherapy more than twice a
                        week.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Feb 2009
Summary:

 On February 24, 2009, the Discipline Committee found Dr.Silver to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee ordered and 
 directed that: 

(a) 	Dr. Silver appear before it to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the register. 

(b) 	Dr. Silver shall pay costs to the College in the 
 amount  of $3,650 within 30 days of the Order.

(c) 	The results of the proceeding are to be 
 included on the public register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 24, 2009