Silver, Meredith May (CPSO#: 19947)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Adelaide, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998