Silver, Robert Donald (CPSO#: 43067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 1 - 439
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6453
Fax: (416) 603-7378
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Silver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Silver ( CPSO# 43067 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Room 1-439
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DONALD SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1985