Silver, Samuel Adam (CPSO#: 88858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
94 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall, Rm. 3032-3043
Kingston, ONT
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 613-548-1397
Fax: 613-548-2524
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel A. Silver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Silver ( CPSO# 88858 )

Business Address:
94 Stuart Street
Suite 3032-3043
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2967

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL ADAM SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012