Silver, Shawna Elissa (CPSO#: 86373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Pediatric Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Paediatrics
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Fax: (416) 756-6152
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawna Silver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Silver ( CPSO# 86373 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6479

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWNA ELISSA SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011