Silver, Stuart Faulkner (CPSO#: 55840)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2005