Silvera, Dwight Andrew (CPSO#: 76094)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dwight A. Silvera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 7 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014