Silverberg, Mark Steven (CPSO#: 65479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 University Avenue
Room 441
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8236
Fax: (416) 619-5524
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayala Revah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silverberg ( CPSO# 65479 )
Dr. A. Revah ( CPSO# 68151 )
Dr. G. Revah ( CPSO# 86656 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 743-2107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK STEVEN SILVERBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993