Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Silverman, Earl Dean (CPSO#: 43100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division Of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6249
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Bargman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Silverman ( CPSO# 43100 )
Dr. J. Bargman ( CPSO# 43099 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
8N-840 North (Norman Urquhart) Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4804

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EARL DEAN SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1984