Silverman, Gregory Lindsay (CPSO#: 81201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept Anesthesia and Pain Management
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GL Silverman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY LINDSAY SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009