Silverman, Mark Steven (CPSO#: 52976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1081 Carling Avenue
Suite 600
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 369-5077
Fax: 855) 461-6774
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK STEVEN SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993