Silverstein, Paul Victor (CPSO#: 29746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH, College Street Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34316
Fax: (416) 979-4680
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 22, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Victor
            Silverstein, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Silverstein to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. PAUL VICTOR SILVERSTEIN
                                          ("Dr. Silverstein")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Silverstein, certificate of registration number 29746, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a
                  College investigation bearing File Number 7214105 (the "Investigation")
                  into my practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake that, effective immediately:
                  
                        (i)   I shall restrict my practice to adult psychiatry only (for
                              patients aged 18 years and older), and shall not treat
                              medical conditions outside the scope of psychiatry; and
                  
                        (ii)  I shall not see any patients in my home office.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least twenty (20) patient records every month or,
                              if less than twenty patients are seen in the month, all of my
                              patient records for that month; 
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me initially to discuss practice improvements and
                              then meet with me monthly at my place of practice.  
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once
                              quarterly, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspector dated May 11, 2015, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" and "B" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fifteen
                        (15) days of the date the ICRC Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Silverstein, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Silverstein, agree that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education at the earliest
                        opportunity:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    pharmacology; 
                  
                              2.    individualized instruction in professionalism approved
                                    by the College, involving one to one sessions with the
                                    Instructor incorporating principles of guided
                                    reflection, tailored feedback and other modalities
                                    specific to the needs of Dr. Silverstein as assessed by
                                    the Instructor.
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) (i)within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (6) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Silverstein, understand and agree that if I am of the view
                        that any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I
                        will have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the
                        recommendations within which to provide the College with my
                        submissions in this regard.  I further understand and agree that
                        thereafter, the ICR Committee will consider my submissions and make
                        a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations, or
                        any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of
                        them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my practice, and
                        that decision will be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake that, following the decision
                        referenced in section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has
                        determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Silverstein, hereby consent to the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice and/or which the ICR
                        Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section
                        (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but
                        not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                        not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Silverstein, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Silverstein, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and
                  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may
                  constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee
                  of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                  understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained
                  independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or
                  have waived my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Silverstein, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Silverstein was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              -     Dr. Silverstein will engage in adult psychiatry only
                                    and will not treat medical conditions outside the scope
                                    of psychiatry;
                  
                              -     Dr. Silverstein will not see any patients in his home
                                    office;
                  
                              -     Dr. Silverstein will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                                    twelve (12) months; 
                  
                              -     Dr. Silverstein will engage in professional education,
                                    including in pharmacology;
                  
                              -     Dr. Silverstein's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within six (6) months
                                    of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Silverstein, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education
                  set out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Silverstein, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Silverstein, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the professional education set out in
                  section (7) above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Victor Silverstein to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 22, 2016.

Dr. Silverstein was the subject of a College investigation into his practice. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Silverstein will engage in adult psychiatry only and will not treat medical conditions outside the scope of psychiatry;

- Dr. Silverstein will not see any patients in his home office;

- Dr. Silverstein will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months;

- Dr. Silverstein will engage in professional education, including in pharmacology;

- Dr. Silverstein’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.