Silviu-Dan, Fanny (CPSO#: 55939)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 03 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Nov 1992