Sim, Franklin Hindson (CPSO#: 69931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 342-2262 Ext. 5546
Fax: (613) 345-4111
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 105, 785 Midpark Drive
Kingston ON  K7M 7G3
Canada
Phone: 343 344 0016
Fax: 343 344 0017
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Franklin H. Sim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sim ( CPSO# 69931 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 342-2262

Business Address:
105 - 785 Midpark Drive
Kingston ON  K7M 7G3

Business Address:
25 Front Avenue West
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone Number: (613) 342-2262

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANKLIN HINDSON SIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001