Sim, Hao-Wen (CPSO#: 105587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 2015

Expiry Date:  28 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology &
Haematology Room 5 216
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5895
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAO-WEN SIM may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SIM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SIM ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SIM ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 28 Feb 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2015 to 23 May 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2018