Sim, Keng Howe (CPSO#: 66453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 518-2933
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Morton Shulman Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 518-2933
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2985 Drew Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A4
Canada
Phone: (877) 837-7251
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howe Sim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sim ( CPSO# 66453 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 518-2933

Business Address:
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 518-2933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENG HOWE SIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997