Sim, Wee Lim (CPSO#: 26729)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Malaya, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - District of Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Jun 2015
Summary:

 On June 2, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sim committed an act of professional 
 misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to 
 24 patients, and in his infection control practices and instrument reprocessing. The Committee 
 also found that Dr. Sim engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional, including: inadequate supervision of members of his staff; 
 improper delegation of responsibilities to his staff; inappropriate electronic communications with 
 patients; inappropriate billing to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; and his failure to refer 
 Patient A for a second opinion. Dr. Sim admitted to the allegations. 
  
 Regarding Patient A, she expressed concerns about the sanitary conditions of Dr. Sim’s office, as 
 well as him pressuring her to have an endometrial biopsy in the office for $20 when she advised 
 that she wished to have it performed elsewhere. A Medical Inspector retained by the College 
 concluded that the main problem in relation to the issues raised in the complaint was a “lack of 
 proper communication”. Dr. Sim “showed a lack of judgement in that he did not refer [Patient A] 
 to another obstetrician/gynecologist for a second opinion concerning her endometrial biopsy and 
 whether it should be performed in an office setting or in a hospital with a hysteroscopy and D 
 &C.”   
  
 In May 2011, the clinic at which Dr. Sim engaged in a therapeutic abortion practice was 
 inspected by the Premises Inspection Committee (PIC) and received a “fail”. Accordingly, Dr. 
 Sim was prohibited from performing any “procedures”, including therapeutic abortions, at his 
 clinic. Among the reasons cited in the report for the “fail” was the clinic’s non-compliance with 
 infection control standards set by the Out of Hospital Premises Standards.  
  
 The PIC brought concerns to the attention of the College’s Registrar regarding the standard of 
 patient care, infection control and the overall function of the premises in relation to Dr. Sim’s 
 abortion practice. Following an investigation, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee 
 (“ICRC”) decided that Dr. Sim should undertake in writing to undergo a re-inspection of his 
practice, as well as a re-assessment regarding record keeping and documentation. Additionally, 
the ICRC counseled Dr. Sim to ensure he practised within his scope of practice.  
  
 In accordance with terms set out in that undertaking, College compliance monitors attended at 
 Dr. Sim’s office in May 2013 to conduct an “infection control inspection of the office premises.” 
 A re-assessment of Dr. Sim’s practice took place in the summer of 2013. The results of the re-
 assessment and infection control inspection led the ICRC to commence another investigation of 
 Dr. Sim’s practice. 
  
 In January 2014, the College received a report prepared by a Medical Inspector retained to 
 investigate infection control issues pertaining to Dr. Sim. The Medical Inspector found that Dr. 
 Sim did not meet the standard of practice in infection control practices and instrument 
 reprocessing. Additionally, she found that Dr. Sim’s infection control and reprocessing practices 
 may put patients at significant risk for harm in terms of transmission of infectious 
 microorganisms, including antibiotic-resistant organisms and blood borne pathogens.   
        
 Between July 2013 and November 2014, the College received several reports from another 
 Medical Inspector who was retained to opine on Dr. Sim’s obstetrical and gynecological 
practice. The Medical Inspector found that Dr. Sim’s practice did not meet the standard of care 
for the practice of the profession, and that he is still performing surgical procedures that should 
not be performed in an office setting. He found that Dr. Sim’s “practice of medically induced 
therapeutic abortions is of harm and danger to the patients because he converts many of these 
into surgical abortions if they do not succeed initially” and “[f]or this reason, [that] Dr. Sim 
 should cease from performing medical or surgical therapeutic abortions in an office setting.”   
  
 As of May 21, 2014, the following term, condition and limitation was imposed on Dr. Sim’s 
 certificate of registration, pursuant to an undertaking made in lieu of a section 37 order: Dr. Sim 
 shall not perform any surgical or medical abortions and shall not engage in any aspect of surgical 
 or medical abortions. All patients seeking termination of pregnancy shall be referred to another 
 physician or facility where Dr. Sim does not practice. The undertaking also required Dr. Sim to 
 adhere to specific infection control practices. 
  
 On May 29, 2015, Dr. Sim signed an undertaking to resign from the College effective June 30, 
 2015, and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario. 
Pursuant to this undertaking, he agreed to be subject to the terms of the May 21, 2014 
undertaking until his resignation becomes effective on June 30, 2015. 
 
Having regard to this May 29, 2015 Undertaking, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 - Dr. Sim attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
   recorded on the Register. 
 - Dr. Sim pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 by June 30, 2015. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): JUne 2, 2015

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: June 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. WEE LIM SIM
(“Dr. Sim”)

to

THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE
(1) I, Dr. Sim, certificate of registration number 26729, am a member of the College.

(2) I, Dr. Sim, acknowledge and agree that the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee referred
allegations that I engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, failed to maintain the
standard of practice of the profession and was incompetent in my obstetrics and gynecology practice to the
Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated April 11, 2014 (the “Notice of Hearing”).

(3) I, Dr. Sim, admit the allegations of professional misconduct in that I engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable
or unprofessional conduct and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Sim, hereby resign from the College effective June 30, 2015 (the “Effective Date”).

(5) I, Dr. Sim, undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in
Ontario after the Effective Date.

(6) I, Dr. Sim, undertake that on June 2, 2015, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario
Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the
Effective Date, and to provide proof of same to the College within 15 days of executing this Undertaking.

(7) I, Dr. Sim, agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this
Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted
to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a


certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in Ontario after the Effective Date, the College
shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of
this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of
Hearing.

(8) I, Dr. Sim, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of time might cause to my ability
to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on the basis of the passage of time,
should the College proceed with any allegations that may arise as a result of a breach of this Undertaking
and/or pursuant to paragraph (6) above.

(9) I, Dr. Sim, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the College’s Policy on Practice Management
Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their
Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix A.

(10) I, Dr. Sim, agree that until my resignation on the Effective Date, I shall continue to be subject to the
terms of the Undertaking dated May 21, 2014, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix B, and that the
current terms, conditions and limitations on my certificate of registration will remain in effect.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(11) I, Dr. Sim, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges,
expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Sim, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided
in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

D. CONSENT
(13) I, Dr. Sim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any
person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance
with the terms of this Undertaking.

(14) I, Dr. Sim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide any person who requires information
for the purposes of ensuring my compliance with this Undertaking with any information the College has that
led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the
monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


(15) I, Dr. Sim, consent to this Undertaking being entered on the public register as information that is
available to the public.