Simantirakis, Pantelis (CPSO#: 60841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3237
Fax: (905) 721-4773
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor Pantelis Simantirakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Simantirakis ( CPSO# 60841 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PANTELIS SIMANTIRAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMANTIRAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1990