Simard, Joseph Bruno Albert Renald (CPSO#: 24280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre 505 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8M2
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 May 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015