Simard, Sylvain (CPSO#: 64803)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 2001