Simchison, Brian Lloyd (CPSO#: 59852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 613 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Simchison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Simchison ( CPSO# 59852 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G3
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN LLOYD SIMCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMCHISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 1997 to 01 Apr 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989