Simcock, Meredith Louise (CPSO#: 87982)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 16 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Mar 2009