Simeunovic, Branko (CPSO#: 86027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington Sleep Laboratory
33 Princess St.
Suite 305
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Phone: 519-325-1333
Fax: 519-325-1338
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

La Salle Medical Associates
2125 Front Rd.
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Canada
Phone: 519-734-1234
Fax: 519-734-8674
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Bluewater Sleep Disorders Clinic
1258 Michigan Ave.
Sarnia ON  N7S 3Y2
Canada
Phone: 519-332-5333
Fax: 519-332-5444
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

1-820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K2
Canada
Phone: 8076834415
Fax: 8076834420
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simeunovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Simeunovic ( CPSO# 86027 )

Business Address:
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 734-1234

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1

Business Address:
Bluewater Sleep Disorders Clinic
1258 Michigan Avenue
Sarnia ON  N7S 3Y2
Phone Number: (519) 332-5333

Business Address:
Leamington Sleep Laboratory
33 Princess Street
Suite 305
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Phone Number: (519) 325-1333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANKO SIMEUNOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMEUNOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Mar 2007 to 22 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009