Simice, Yana (CPSO#: 78514)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filanovsky & Simice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008