Siminovitch, Katherine Anne (CPSO#: 31813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 778D
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8723
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathy Siminovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Siminovitch ( CPSO# 31813 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 778D
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8723

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANNE SIMINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMINOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1980