Simitciu, Merita (CPSO#: 87148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Hospitals, Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Rd,
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400 Ext. 2561
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Merita Simitciu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Simitciu ( CPSO# 87148 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERITA SIMITCIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMITCIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2009 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2010 to 13 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2011 to 13 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012