Simkin, Sarah Rachel (CPSO#: 76355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811 Ext. 8705
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000 Ext. 2900
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: 613-256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

The Teal Umbrella
Family Dental Healthcare
200-1580 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2G 4B5
Canada
Phone: 613-216-9296
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH RACHEL SIMKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004