Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Simmons, Malcolm Charles (CPSO#: 55677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Ave.
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: (905) 889-1125 Ext. 261
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 405, The Court at Centenary
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E5E9
Canada
Phone: 4162873733
Fax: 4162873957
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cam Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALCOLM CHARLES SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1987