Simmons, Pamela Angelica (CPSO#: 69234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: (416) 431-7100
Fax: (416) 431-7191
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
1346 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1N 1P9
Canada
Phone: (416) 698-0883
Fax: (416) 698-0917
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA ANGELICA SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1999