Simmons, Rachel Ann (CPSO#: 96845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
Box 667
20129 Erie Street South
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2C0
Phone: (519) 674-2600 Ext. 1
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel A. Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Simmons ( CPSO# 96845 )

Business Address:
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
Box 67
20129 Eries Street South
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2X0
Phone Number: (519) 674-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Rachel Ann Simmons may practise medicine independently in family medicine.